House | 05/05/2023 | Died in Water Quality, Supply & Treatment Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | Added to Water Quality, Supply & Treatment Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 02/14/2023 | Now in Water Quality, Supply & Treatment Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/14/2023 | Referred to Infrastructure Strategies Committee | ||
House | 02/14/2023 | Referred to Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/14/2023 | Referred to Water Quality, Supply & Treatment Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/08/2023 | Filed |