House | 05/05/2023 | Died in State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/31/2023 | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) | ||
House | 03/31/2023 | Now in State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/31/2023 | Referred to Commerce Committee | ||
House | 03/31/2023 | Referred to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | CS Filed | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Reported out of Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Favorable with CS by Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/24/2023 | Added to Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 02/14/2023 | Now in Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/14/2023 | Referred to Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/08/2023 | Filed |