Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0691 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11
22
33 HB 691 2023
44
55
66
77 CODING: Words stricken are deletions; words underlined are additions.
88 hb0691-00
99 Page 1 of 5
1010 F L O R I D A H O U S E O F R E P R E S E N T A T I V E S
1111
1212
1313
1414 A bill to be entitled 1
1515 An act relating to the recycling of covered electronic 2
1616 devices; creating s. 403.71853, F.S.; defining terms; 3
1717 establishing the statewide Covered Electronic Device 4
1818 Recovery Program within the Department of 5
1919 Environmental Protection; authorizing the department 6
2020 to use specified funds to administer the program; 7
2121 specifying requirements for a statewide plan for the 8
2222 recycling of covered electronic devices; requiring 9
2323 counties to submit a specified plan for the disposal 10
2424 of covered electronic devices by a specified date; 11
2525 requiring the owners or operators of certain 12
2626 facilities to dispose of such facilities' covered 13
2727 electronic devices in a permitted reclamation facility 14
2828 beginning on a specified date; prohibiting any person 15
2929 from disposing of covered electronic devices except at 16
3030 a permitted reclamation facility beginning on a 17
3131 specified date; providing civil penalties; authorizing 18
3232 such penalties to be waived under certain conditions ; 19
3333 providing applicability; requiring the department to 20
3434 deposit any funds received pursuant to the program 21
3535 into the Solid Waste Management Trust Fund to be used 22
3636 for specified purposes; requiring the department to 23
3737 adopt rules that meet certain requirements b y a 24
3838 specified date; providing an effective date. 25
3939
4040 HB 691 2023
4141
4242
4343
4444 CODING: Words stricken are deletions; words underlined are additions.
4545 hb0691-00
4646 Page 2 of 5
4747 F L O R I D A H O U S E O F R E P R E S E N T A T I V E S
4848
4949
5050
5151 26
5252 WHEREAS, it is recognized that China presents the broadest, 27
5353 most active and persistent cyber espionage threat to the United 28
5454 States Government and private sector networks, and 29
5555 WHEREAS, the technology p roducts and services most 30
5656 vulnerable to malicious foreign exploitation are sold by 31
5757 companies that the Chinese Government influences through whole 32
5858 or partial ownership, direct funding, or members placed in high -33
5959 ranking company positions, and 34
6060 WHEREAS, it is the intent of the Legislature to incentivize 35
6161 and provide the necessary infrastructure to recycle electronic 36
6262 and technology products in the state in order to reduce our 37
6363 economic reliance on such products made in China, NOW, 38
6464 THEREFORE, 39
6565 40
6666 Be It Enacted by the Legislature of the State of Florida: 41
6767 42
6868 Section 1. Section 403.71853, Florida Statutes, is created 43
6969 to read: 44
7070 403.71853 Recycling of covered electronic devices. — 45
7171 (1) DEFINITIONS.—As used in this section, the term: 46
7272 (a) "Covered electronic device" mea ns a computer, portable 47
7373 computer, computer monitor, or television, whether it has a 48
7474 cathode ray tube or flat panel based on any technology, with a 49
7575 screen size greater than 4 inches measured diagonally. The term 50
7676
7777 HB 691 2023
7878
7979
8080
8181 CODING: Words stricken are deletions; words underlined are additions.
8282 hb0691-00
8383 Page 3 of 5
8484 F L O R I D A H O U S E O F R E P R E S E N T A T I V E S
8585
8686
8787
8888 does not include an electronic device that is : 51
8989 1. A part of a motor vehicle or any component part of a 52
9090 motor vehicle assembled by or for a vehicle manufacturer or 53
9191 franchised dealer, including, but not limited to, replacement 54
9292 parts for use in a motor vehicle; 55
9393 2. Functionally or physically a part o f a larger piece of 56
9494 equipment designed and intended for use in an industrial, 57
9595 commercial, or medical setting, including, but not limited to, 58
9696 diagnostic, monitoring, or control equipment; 59
9797 3. Contained within a clothes washer, clothes dryer, 60
9898 refrigerator, refrigerator and freezer, microwave oven, 61
9999 conventional oven or range, dishwasher, room air conditioner, 62
100100 dehumidifier, or air purifier; or 63
101101 4. A telephone of any type. 64
102102 (b) "Reclamation facility" means a site permitted by the 65
103103 department where equipment is used to handle, process, 66
104104 disassemble, dismantle, shred, recapture, or store recoverable 67
105105 materials. The term includes, but is not limited to, composting 68
106106 or remediation facilities. 69
107107 (2) STATEWIDE COVERED ELECTRONIC DEVICE RECOVERY PROGRAM. —70
108108 The statewide Covered Electronic Device Recovery Program is 71
109109 established within the Department of Environmental Protection. 72
110110 The department may use funds from the Solid Waste Management 73
111111 Trust Fund to administer the program. The purpose of the program 74
112112 is to create a statewid e plan for the recycling of covered 75
113113
114114 HB 691 2023
115115
116116
117117
118118 CODING: Words stricken are deletions; words underlined are additions.
119119 hb0691-00
120120 Page 4 of 5
121121 F L O R I D A H O U S E O F R E P R E S E N T A T I V E S
122122
123123
124124
125125 electronic devices. In creating the statewide plan, the 76
126126 department must consider all of the following: 77
127127 (a) Existing collection and consolidation infrastructure 78
128128 for collecting covered electronic devices. 79
129129 (b) Convenience standards for each county or solid waste 80
130130 authority serving one or more counties. 81
131131 (c) County population statistics and data of residents. 82
132132 (d) Administrative costs and other authorized expenses 83
133133 necessary to prevent the disposal of covered electric dev ices in 84
134134 landfills. 85
135135 (3) COMPLIANCE TIMELINE. — 86
136136 (a) By January 1, 2025, each county must submit a plan to 87
137137 the department for ensuring the county will appropriately 88
138138 dispose of covered electronic devices at a permitted reclamation 89
139139 facility. 90
140140 (b) Effective January 1, 2026, any person who owns or 91
141141 operates an industrial, institutional, or commercial facility in 92
142142 this state shall dispose of that facility's covered electronic 93
143143 devices in a permitted reclamation facility. 94
144144 (c) Effective January 1, 2028, it is unla wful for any 95
145145 person to dispose of covered electronic devices in this state 96
146146 except at a permitted reclamation facility. 97
147147 (4) CIVIL PENALTY.—A person who engages in an unlawful act 98
148148 as provided in this section or who violates the rules of the 99
149149 department adopted pursuant to this section is liable for 100
150150
151151 HB 691 2023
152152
153153
154154
155155 CODING: Words stricken are deletions; words underlined are additions.
156156 hb0691-00
157157 Page 5 of 5
158158 F L O R I D A H O U S E O F R E P R E S E N T A T I V E S
159159
160160
161161
162162 damages and subject to civil penalties under s. 403.141. The 101
163163 penalty may be waived if the person has previously taken 102
164164 appropriate corrective action to remedy the actual damages, if 103
165165 any, caused by the unlawful act or rule violation. Section 104
166166 403.161 does not apply to this section. 105
167167 (5) PROGRAM FUNDS.—The department shall dep osit any funds 106
168168 received pursuant to this section into the Solid Waste 107
169169 Management Trust Fund and shall account for such funds 108
170170 separately within the fund. The funds may be used upon 109
171171 appropriation to provide grants to local governments and other 110
172172 public and private entities to develop and operate regional 111
173173 covered electronic device recycling programs and for 112
174174 administrative costs and other authorized expenses necessary to 113
175175 carry out the responsibilities of this section. 114
176176 (6) RULES.—By July 1, 2024, the department shall adopt 115
177177 rules to carry out this section. Such rules must include all of 116
178178 the following: 117
179179 (a) Criteria and procedures for obtaining a reclamation 118
180180 facility permit. 119
181181 (b) Standards for reclamation facilities and associated 120
182182 collection centers and standard s for the storage of covered 121
183183 electronic devices. 122
184184 (c) Requirements for the collection of data on the amounts 123
185185 of precious metals recovered through the program. 124
186186 Section 2. This act shall take effect July 1, 2023. 125