House | 05/05/2023 | Died in Infrastructure Strategies Committee | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Now in Infrastructure Strategies Committee | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Reported out of Civil Justice Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Favorable by Civil Justice Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Added to Civil Justice Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Now in Civil Justice Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Referred to Infrastructure Strategies Committee | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | CS Filed | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Reported out of Transportation & Modals Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Favorable with CS by Transportation & Modals Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | PCS added to Transportation & Modals Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | Now in Transportation & Modals Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | Referred to Transportation & Modals Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/09/2023 | Filed |