House | 05/05/2023 | Died in Commerce Committee | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | Now in Commerce Committee | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | Reported out of Ways & Means Committee | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | Favorable by Ways & Means Committee | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Added to Ways & Means Committee agenda | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | Now in Ways & Means Committee | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | Referred to Commerce Committee | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | Referred to Ways & Means Committee | ||
House | 02/10/2023 | Filed |