House
|
05/05/2023
|
Died on Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 3)
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
Reported out of State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Favorable with CS by State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Added to State Affairs Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Now in State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Referred to State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Reported out of Agriculture, Conservation & Resiliency Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Agriculture, Conservation & Resiliency Subcommittee(Amended)
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added to Agriculture, Conservation & Resiliency Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Now in Agriculture, Conservation & Resiliency Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Referred to Agriculture, Conservation & Resiliency Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Original reference removed: Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Reported out of Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government Operations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government Operations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Added to Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government Operations Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Now in Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government Operations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Referred to Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government Operations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|