Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0717 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 10, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 11, 2023
Analysis April 7, 2023
Analysis March 29, 2023
Analysis March 27, 2023
Analysis March 20, 2023
Analysis March 19, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 20, 2023