Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0723 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 10, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 11, 2023
Analysis April 7, 2023
Analysis March 27, 2023
Analysis March 24, 2023
Analysis March 20, 2023
Analysis March 17, 2023