House
|
05/01/2023
|
Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see SB 678 (Ch. 2023-116)
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Reported out of Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Favorable by Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Added to Infrastructure Strategies Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Now in Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Reported out of Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Favorable by Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Added to Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Now in Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Reported out of Transportation & Modals Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Favorable by Transportation & Modals Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Added to Transportation & Modals Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Now in Transportation & Modals Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Referred to Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Referred to Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Referred to Transportation & Modals Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|