Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Died in Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Referred to Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
In Messages
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
CS passed; YEAS 112, NAYS 2
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/27/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Reported out of Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Added to Judiciary Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Now in Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Reported out of Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Favorable by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Added to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Now in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Referred to Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Referred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Reported out of Criminal Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
PCS added to Criminal Justice Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Now in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|