House | 05/05/2023 | Died in Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 233 (Ch. 2023-109) | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Now in Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Reported out of Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Favorable by Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Added to Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | Now in Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | Referred to Commerce Committee | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | Referred to Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | Referred to Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/14/2023 | Filed |