House | 05/05/2023 | Died in Commerce Committee | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Now in Commerce Committee | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Reported out of Insurance & Banking Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Favorable by Insurance & Banking Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Added to Insurance & Banking Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Now in Insurance & Banking Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Reported out of Ways & Means Committee | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Favorable by Ways & Means Committee | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Added to Ways & Means Committee agenda | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | Now in Ways & Means Committee | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | Referred to Commerce Committee | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | Referred to Insurance & Banking Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | Referred to Ways & Means Committee | ||
House | 02/14/2023 | Filed |