|
06/12/2023
|
Chapter No. 2023-210
|
|
|
|
06/09/2023
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
06/05/2023
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Passed; YEAS 35 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Substituted for SB 410
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Withdrawn from Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Referred to Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Passed as amended; YEAS 105, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Amendment 069983 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/28/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Reported out of Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Favorable by Commerce Committee (Amended)
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Added to Commerce Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Now in Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Reported out of State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Favorable by State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Added to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Now in State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Reported out of Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Favorable by Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Added to Insurance & Banking Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Now in Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Referred to Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Referred to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Referred to Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|