|
06/01/2023
|
Chapter No. 2023-175; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 154 (Ch. 2023-203), SB 2502 (Ch. 2023-240)
|
|
|
|
05/31/2023
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
05/16/2023
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Ordered engrossed, then enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 87, NAYS 28
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Amendment 593712 Concur
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Amendment 140692 Concur
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Added to Senate Message List
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 32 NAYS 7
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Amendment(s) adopted (140692, 593712)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Substituted for CS/CS/SB 594
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Withdrawn from Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Referred to Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
CS passed; YEAS 115, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 3)
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/25/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Reported out of Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
PCS added to Commerce Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Now in Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Referred to Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Reported out of State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Favorable with CS by State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Added to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Now in State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Reported out of Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
PCS added to Insurance & Banking Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Now in Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Referred to Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|