Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0815 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 14, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 5, 2023

Analysis

Analysis July 10, 2023
Analysis May 15, 2023
Analysis April 19, 2023
Analysis April 17, 2023
Analysis March 29, 2023
Analysis March 27, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 19, 2023