Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0825 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 14, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 2, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 25, 2023
Analysis May 17, 2023
Analysis April 11, 2023
Analysis April 7, 2023
Analysis March 27, 2023
Analysis March 24, 2023
Analysis March 13, 2023
Analysis March 10, 2023