Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0839 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2023

Analysis

Analysis June 21, 2023
Analysis May 17, 2023
Analysis April 11, 2023
Analysis March 29, 2023
Analysis March 22, 2023
Analysis March 20, 2023
Analysis March 10, 2023
Analysis March 7, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 12, 2023
Bill March 10, 2023