House | 05/05/2023 | Died in Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government Operations Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Now in Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government Operations Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Reported out of Education Quality Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Favorable by Education Quality Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Added to Education Quality Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | Now in Education Quality Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | Referred to Education & Employment Committee | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | Referred to Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government Operations Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | Referred to Education Quality Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | Filed |