House | 05/05/2023 | Died in Judiciary Committee | ||
House | 03/31/2023 | Now in Judiciary Committee | ||
House | 03/31/2023 | Original reference removed: Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/31/2023 | Referred to Judiciary Committee | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | CS Filed | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Reported out of Criminal Justice Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Favorable with CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | PCS added to Criminal Justice Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Now in Criminal Justice Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Referred to Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Filed |