Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Died in Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Referred to Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
In Messages
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
CS passed; YEAS 94, NAYS 10
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/28/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Reported out of Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Favorable by Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 3)
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Added to Health & Human Services Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Now in Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Referred to Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Reported out of Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Added to Appropriations Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Now in Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Reported out of Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Added to Civil Justice Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Now in Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
Reported out of Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Added to Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Now in Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Referred to Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|