Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Died in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Referred to Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
In Messages
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
CS passed; YEAS 111, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/30/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2023
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2023
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
Reported out of Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added to Health & Human Services Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Now in Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Reported out of Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Favorable by Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Added to Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Now in Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Referred to Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Referred to Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|