House
|
04/20/2023
|
Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 978 (Ch. 2023-266)
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Substituted CS/SB 978
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/20/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Reported out of Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Added to Judiciary Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Now in Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Reported out of Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Favorable by Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
Added to Insurance & Banking Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Now in Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Reported out of Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Favorable by Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Added to Civil Justice Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Now in Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Referred to Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Referred to Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|