Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0909 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 16, 2023
Analysis March 31, 2023
Analysis March 29, 2023
Analysis March 21, 2023
Analysis March 17, 2023
Analysis March 10, 2023
Analysis March 7, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 31, 2023
Bill March 10, 2023