House
|
04/25/2023
|
Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 1278 (Ch. 2023-310)
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Substituted CS/SB 1278
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/25/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Reported out of Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
PCS added to Education & Employment Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Now in Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Reported out of Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Favorable by Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Added to Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Now in Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Reported out of Education Quality Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Favorable by Education Quality Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Added to Education Quality Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Now in Education Quality Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Referred to Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Referred to Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Referred to Education Quality Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|