House
|
05/02/2023
|
Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 7016 (Ch. 2023-268)
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 3)
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Reported out of Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Added to Judiciary Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Now in Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Referred to Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Reported out of Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
PCS added to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Now in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Referred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Reported out of Criminal Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Added to Criminal Justice Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Now in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|