Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0939 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 17, 2023
Analysis March 31, 2023
Analysis March 29, 2023
Analysis March 22, 2023
Analysis March 18, 2023
Analysis March 14, 2023
Analysis March 9, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 31, 2023
Bill March 22, 2023
Bill March 14, 2023