Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0949 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 28, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 1, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 22, 2023
Analysis May 4, 2023
Analysis April 17, 2023
Analysis April 13, 2023
Analysis March 30, 2023
Analysis March 27, 2023
Analysis March 16, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 30, 2023
Bill March 16, 2023