LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Florida FL
Legislatures
2023 Regular Session
House
Bills
H0967
Draft Versions
FL
Florida House Bill H0967
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Florida 2023 Regular Session
Florida House Bill H0967
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
February 21, 2023
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
May 2, 2023
Compare
Analysis
Analysis
June 23, 2023
Analysis
May 16, 2023
Analysis
April 17, 2023
Analysis
April 16, 2023
Analysis
April 12, 2023
Analysis
April 11, 2023
Analysis
April 3, 2023
Analysis
March 31, 2023
Comm Sub
Bill
April 3, 2023
Compare