Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1007 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2023

Analysis

Analysis June 19, 2023
Analysis May 17, 2023
Analysis April 24, 2023
Analysis April 23, 2023
Analysis March 27, 2023
Analysis March 24, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 25, 2023
Bill March 27, 2023