Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1071 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 23, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 30, 2023
Analysis May 3, 2023
Analysis April 11, 2023
Analysis April 6, 2023
Analysis March 30, 2023
Analysis March 27, 2023
Analysis March 12, 2023
Analysis March 9, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 11, 2023
Bill March 30, 2023
Bill March 13, 2023