House
|
05/01/2023
|
Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 272 (Ch. 2023-248)
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/27/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Reported out of Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Added to Health & Human Services Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Now in Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Original reference removed: Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Referred to Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Reported out of Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added to Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Now in Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Referred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Referred to Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|