House | 05/05/2023 | Died in Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 847 (Ch. 2023-151) | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Now in Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Reported out of Agriculture, Conservation & Resiliency Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Favorable by Agriculture, Conservation & Resiliency Subcommittee(Amended) | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Added to Agriculture, Conservation & Resiliency Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Now in Agriculture, Conservation & Resiliency Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Referred to Infrastructure Strategies Committee | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Referred to Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Referred to Agriculture, Conservation & Resiliency Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Filed |