House | 05/05/2023 | Died in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/28/2023 | Now in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/28/2023 | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) | ||
House | 03/28/2023 | Referred to Education & Employment Committee | ||
House | 03/28/2023 | Referred to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | CS Filed | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Reported out of Choice & Innovation Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Favorable with CS by Choice & Innovation Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Added to Choice & Innovation Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Now in Choice & Innovation Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Referred to Choice & Innovation Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Filed |