Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1121 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 23, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 28, 2023

Analysis

Analysis July 10, 2023
Analysis May 10, 2023
Analysis April 19, 2023
Analysis April 17, 2023
Analysis March 28, 2023
Analysis March 24, 2023
Analysis March 22, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 20, 2023
Bill March 22, 2023