Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1129 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2023

Analysis

Analysis June 21, 2023
Analysis May 17, 2023
Analysis April 11, 2023
Analysis April 7, 2023
Analysis April 4, 2023
Analysis April 1, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 4, 2023