Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1135 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2023

Analysis

Analysis June 19, 2023
Analysis May 17, 2023
Analysis March 31, 2023
Analysis March 29, 2023
Analysis March 21, 2023
Analysis March 18, 2023
Analysis March 13, 2023
Analysis March 10, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 31, 2023