Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1169 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 5, 2023

Analysis

Analysis July 10, 2023
Analysis May 15, 2023
Analysis March 23, 2023
Analysis March 21, 2023
Analysis March 15, 2023
Analysis March 13, 2023