Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1191 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 1, 2023

Analysis

Analysis July 10, 2023
Analysis May 3, 2023
Analysis April 18, 2023
Analysis April 13, 2023
Analysis March 27, 2023
Analysis March 24, 2023
Analysis March 16, 2023
Analysis March 14, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 18, 2023
Bill March 16, 2023