|
06/26/2023
|
Chapter No. 2023-289
|
|
|
|
06/23/2023
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
06/14/2023
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
CS passed; YEAS 26 NAYS 11
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Amendment(s) failed (201036)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Substituted for SB 1246
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Withdrawn from Rules
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
CS passed; YEAS 79, NAYS 37
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/25/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Reported out of Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Favorable by Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Added to Judiciary Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Now in Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Original reference removed: Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Referred to Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Reported out of Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Added to Civil Justice Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
Now in Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
Referred to Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|