Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1207 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 1, 2023

Analysis

Analysis June 27, 2023
Analysis May 8, 2023
Analysis April 12, 2023
Analysis April 11, 2023
Analysis March 23, 2023
Analysis March 21, 2023
Analysis March 15, 2023
Analysis March 13, 2023