House
|
05/05/2023
|
Died on Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2023
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2023
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Reported out of Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2023
|
PCS added to Education & Employment Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Now in Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Reported out of Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Favorable by Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added to Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Now in Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Referred to Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Referred to Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Reported out of Postsecondary Education & Workforce Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Postsecondary Education & Workforce Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
PCS added to Postsecondary Education & Workforce Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Added to Postsecondary Education & Workforce Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
Now in Postsecondary Education & Workforce Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
Referred to Postsecondary Education & Workforce Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|