05/26/2023 | Chapter No. 2023-167; companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500 (Ch. 2023-239) | |||
05/26/2023 | Approved by Governor | |||
05/22/2023 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |||
House | 05/05/2023 | Ordered engrossed, then enrolled | ||
House | 05/05/2023 | Passed as amended by Conference Committee Report; YEAS 91, NAYS 20 | ||
House | 05/05/2023 | Conference Committee Report adopted | ||
House | 05/05/2023 | Amendment 127735 adopted | ||
House | 05/05/2023 | Conference Committee Report considered | ||
Senate | 05/05/2023 | Passed as amended by Conference Committee Report; YEAS 28 NAYS 11 | ||
Senate | 05/05/2023 | Conference Committee Report adopted (127735) | ||
Senate | 05/05/2023 | Conference Committee Report received | ||
House | 05/05/2023 | In Messages | ||
Senate | 05/05/2023 | Read 3rd time | ||
Senate | 05/05/2023 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 05/04/2023 | Conference Committee appointed | ||
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Conference Committee appointed: Conference Committee on Appropriations: Broxson (Chair), Albritton (At Large), Baxley (At Large), Book (At Large), Hutson (At Large), Mayfield (At Large), Perry (At Large), Rouson (At Large); Conference Committee On Agriculture, Environment, And General Government/Agriculture and Natural Resources: Brodeur (Chair), Albritton, Berman, Boyd, DiCeglie, Garcia, Grall, Gruters, Mayfield, Osgood, Polsky, Rodriguez, Stewart, Trumbull, Baxley (At Large), Book (At Large), Hutson (At Large), Perry (At Large), Rouson (At Large); Conference Committee On Agriculture, Environment, And General Government/State Administration and Technology: Brodeur (Chair), Albritton, Berman, Boyd, DiCeglie, Garcia, Grall, Gruters, Mayfield, Osgood, Polsky, Rodriguez, Stewart, Trumbull, Baxley (At Large), Book (At Large), Hutson (At Large), Perry (At Large), Rouson (At Large); Conference Committee On Criminal And Civil Justice/Justice: Bradley (Chair), Baxley, Burgess, Hooper, Ingoglia, Martin, Pizzo, Powell, Rouson, Torres, Wright, Yarborough, Albritton (At Large), Book (At Large), Hutson (At Large), Mayfield (At Large), Perry (At Large); Conference Committee On Education/Higher Education: Perry (Chair), Avila, Book, Broxson, Burton, Calatayud, Collins, Davis, Harrell, Hutson, Jones, Simon, Thompson, Albritton (At Large), Baxley (At Large), Mayfield (At Large), Rouson (At Large); Conference Committee On Education/PreK-12: Perry (Chair), Avila, Book, Broxson, Burton, Calatayud, Collins, Davis, Harrell, Hutson, Jones, Simon, Thompson, Albritton (At Large), Baxley (At Large), Mayfield (At Large), Rouson (At Large); Conference Committee On Health And Human Services/Health Care: Harrell (Chair), Avila, Baxley, Book, Bradley, Brodeur, Burgess, Burton, Calatayud, Davis, Garcia, Gruters, Martin, Osgood, Rouson, Simon, Albritton (At Large), Hutson (At Large), Mayfield (At Large), Perry (At Large); Conference Committee On Transportation, Tourism, And Economic Development/Infrastructure and Tourism: Hooper (Chair), Collins, DiCeglie, Grall, Perry, Polsky, Powell, Stewart, Thompson, Trumbull, Wright, Yarborough, Albritton (At Large), Baxley (At Large), Book (At Large), Hutson (At Large), Mayfield (At Large), Rouson (At Large); | ||
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Bill placed in Conference (Conference Committee on Appropriations) | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 13 NAYS 6 | ||
Senate | 04/20/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/25/23, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Received | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Requests that the Senate pass the bill as passed by the House or agree to include the bill in the Budget Conference | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | CS passed; YEAS 81, NAYS 31 | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Added to Third Reading Calendar | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Placed on 3rd reading | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2) | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/3/2023) | ||
House | 03/28/2023 | Bill referred to House Calendar | ||
House | 03/28/2023 | Reported out of Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 03/28/2023 | Favorable with CS by Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 03/28/2023 | CS Filed | ||
House | 03/28/2023 | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) | ||
House | 03/24/2023 | Added to Appropriations Committee agenda | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Now in Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Referred to Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | Reported out of State Affairs Committee | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Favorable with CS by State Affairs Committee | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Added to State Affairs Committee agenda | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | Now in State Affairs Committee | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | Referred to State Affairs Committee | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Filed |