|
05/26/2023
|
Chapter No. 2023-155
|
|
|
|
05/25/2023
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
05/16/2023
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
CS passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Substituted for CS/SB 1150
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Withdrawn from Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Referred to Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
CS passed; YEAS 115, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/25/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Reported out of Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Favorable by Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Added to Commerce Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Now in Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Referred to Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Reported out of Criminal Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Added to Criminal Justice Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Now in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Reported out of Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Favorable by Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Added to Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
Now in Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
Referred to Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|