Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1317 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 1, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 21, 2023
Bill March 16, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 21, 2023
Analysis April 13, 2023
Analysis March 29, 2023
Analysis March 27, 2023
Analysis March 16, 2023
Analysis March 14, 2023