Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1319 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 1, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 15, 2023
Analysis March 31, 2023
Analysis March 29, 2023
Analysis March 20, 2023
Analysis March 17, 2023