|
06/16/2023
|
Chapter No. 2023-235
|
|
|
|
06/14/2023
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
06/12/2023
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Substituted for CS/SB 1402
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Withdrawn from Rules
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
Referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
CS passed; YEAS 112, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/20/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Reported out of Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Favorable by Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2023
|
Added to Judiciary Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Now in Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Reported out of Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Favorable by Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Added to Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Now in Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Referred to Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Referred to Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Reported out of Criminal Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
Added to Criminal Justice Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
Now in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|