House | 05/05/2023 | Died in Commerce Committee | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Now in Commerce Committee | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Original reference removed: Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Referred to Commerce Committee | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | CS Filed | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Reported out of Energy, Communications & Cybersecurity Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Favorable with CS by Energy, Communications & Cybersecurity Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/17/2023 | PCS added to Energy, Communications & Cybersecurity Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Now in Energy, Communications & Cybersecurity Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Referred to Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Referred to Energy, Communications & Cybersecurity Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Filed |