Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1335 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 2, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 18, 2023
Bill March 29, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 18, 2023
Analysis April 16, 2023
Analysis March 29, 2023
Analysis March 26, 2023