Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1349 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 2, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 2, 2023

Analysis

Analysis June 22, 2023
Analysis May 16, 2023
Analysis April 17, 2023
Analysis April 16, 2023
Analysis April 12, 2023
Analysis April 11, 2023
Analysis March 27, 2023
Analysis March 24, 2023