House | 05/05/2023 | Died on Second Reading Calendar | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Added to Second Reading Calendar | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Bill referred to House Calendar | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | CS Filed | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Reported out of Health & Human Services Committee | ||
House | 04/17/2023 | Favorable with CS by Health & Human Services Committee | ||
House | 04/13/2023 | Added to Health & Human Services Committee agenda | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Now in Health & Human Services Committee | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Reported out of Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Favorable by Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Added to Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Now in Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Referred to Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Filed |